Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sante Cardinal Veronese

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1684BornVenice
4 Aug 170925.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 175874.1AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
19 Nov 1758³74.3Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
24 Sep 175975.1Elevated to Cardinal
1 Feb 176782.5DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sante Veronese:
Sante Cardinal Veronese (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
  • a cardinal for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,018
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1758, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015