Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionigi Latomo

Deceased

Bishop of Alessano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1703Born
16 Apr 172926.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 175451.7AppointedBishop of Alessano, Italy
21 Dec 175451.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alessano, Italy
8 Jan 178076.8DiedBishop of Alessano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dionigi Latomo
Bishop Dionigi Latomo (born , died ) Bishop of Alessano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrindisi

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1773
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018