Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Guglielmi

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1680BornJesi
20 Dec 170424.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 May 171736.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 173958.6AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
5 Jul 173958.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
5 Feb 176685.2DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Guglielmi:
Archbishop Antonio Guglielmi (born , died ) Archbishop of Urbino

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015