Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Branciforte Colonna

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1711BornPalermo
1 Jan 175442.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Feb 175443.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 175443.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
17 Feb 175443.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
26 Sep 176655.6Elevated to Cardinal
6 Apr 176756.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
25 Feb 177665.0SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
15 Apr 177665.2ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
31 Jul 178675.5DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Branciforte Colonna:
Antonio Cardinal Branciforte Colonna (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
  • a cardinal for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 71, and Page 404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015