Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Despuig Cotoner

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1703¹Born
27 Apr 175047.3AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
3 May 175047.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
18 Jul 176360.5AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
22 Jul 176461.5DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Despuig Cotoner
Archbishop Lorenzo Despuig Cotoner (born 1703, died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalma de Mallorca

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 68, Number 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 273, and Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast