Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Castrensis Scaja

Deceased

Bishop of Oria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1698Born
20 Dec 172022.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Mar 172223.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 174648.1AppointedBishop of Oria, Italy
30 Nov 174648.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
12 Oct 175557.0DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Castrensis Scaja
Bishop Castrensis Scaja (born , died ) Bishop of Oria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarano

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 427
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018