Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Bajardi

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1712BornParma
18 Mar 174129.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 May 174129.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 175341.1AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
23 Apr 175341.1Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
14 Jul 175341.4InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
24 Aug 177563.5DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Bajardi:
Bishop Girolamo Bajardi (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 135
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 12 Nov 2015