Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Maria de Francisco e Galletti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Tamiathis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1691Born
26 May 171422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Apr 175361.8AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
23 Apr 175361.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
19 Dec 175766.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
19 Jul 176978.0DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria de Francisco e Galletti
Archbishop Vincenzo Maria de Francisco e Galletti O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1763
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 192, and Page 263
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018