Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erasmo Mastrilli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1715BornNapoli
25 Aug 173822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Sep 175742.0AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
2 Oct 175742.0Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
Jan 1769³53.3DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Erasmo Mastrilli:
Bishop Erasmo Mastrilli O.S.B. (born , died Jan 1769) Bishop of Isernia

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015