Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Borrull Ramón

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1695BornValencia
26 Sep 175762.0AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
2 Oct 175762.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
5 Aug 176872.8DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Borrull Ramón:
Bishop Francisco Borrull Ramón (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 75, Number 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013