Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Vegni

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1686Born
19 Sep 171024.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 173953.2AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
30 Nov 173953.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
15 Aug 174458.0DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vegni
Bishop Antonio Vegni (born , died ) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Giova

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018