Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Maria Capece Galeota, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1699BornSorrento
20 Dec 172122.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
19 Sep 172222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
6 May 174848.6AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
12 May 174848.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
20 Aug 176464.8AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
18 Nov 177778.1ResignedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
15 Dec 177778.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
14 Jun 177878.7DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Maria Capece Galeota:
Archbishop Michele Maria Capece Galeota C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 147, and Page 190
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 233
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015