Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Angelo Ciocchi del Monte

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1705BornVico
18 Sep 172823.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 175145.4AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
7 Feb 175145.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
9 Feb 175953.4ResignedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
28 Apr 176256.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Angelo Ciocchi del Monte:
Archbishop Giovanni Angelo Ciocchi del Monte (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013