Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Rivera

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1697³BornL’Aquila
20 Sep 172124.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 173335.8AppointedBishop of Città Ducale, Italy
28 Jun 173335.8Ordained BishopBishop of Città Ducale, Italy
25 May 174244.7AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
25 Jan 177779.4DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Rivera:
Archbishop Francesco Rivera (born , died ) Archbishop of Manfredonia

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 167, and Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015