Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Altieri (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1673BornRome, Italy
12 Jun 172450.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
30 Jun 172450.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Jul 172450.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 172451.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
11 Sep 172451.1Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 172451.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
26 Jan 173965.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
12 Mar 174066.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Altieri (Jr.):
Cardinal Giovanni Battista Altieri (Jr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a priest for 15.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
  • a cardinal for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1724
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013