Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vincenzo Maria Altieri

Deceased


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1724BornRome
23 Jun 177752.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
11 Dec 178056.0Elevated to Cardinal
2 Apr 178156.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
23 Apr 178762.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
10 Mar 178863.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
12 Sep 179469.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
7 Sep 179873.8ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
10 Feb 180075.2Died

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Altieri:
Priest Vincenzo Maria Altieri (born , died ) of (unknown)

  • a cardinal for 21.2 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1777

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013