Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop NicolÚ Carmine Falcone

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1681BornNapoli
6 May 170826.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 May 170826.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 173351.9AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
28 Jun 173351.9Ordained BishopBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
15 Jul 174361.9AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
1 Mar 175977.6DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Carmine Falcone:
Archbishop NicolÚ Carmine Falcone (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1736
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 279, and Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1733, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015