Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Magnoni

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1682BornSiena
18 Dec 170624.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 173654.0AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
15 Jul 173654.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi, Italy
4 Sep 174765.1AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
4 Oct 175573.2DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pio Magnoni:
Bishop Pio Magnoni (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013