Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Serafino Brancone (Branconi), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gallipoli

Titular Archbishop of Thebae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1710BornNapoli
30 May 173322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Feb 174736.6SelectedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
10 Apr 174736.8ConfirmedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
16 Apr 174736.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
27 Jan 175948.5ResignedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
12 Feb 175948.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
15 Aug 177464.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Serafino Brancone (Branconi):
Archbishop Serafino Brancone (Branconi) O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gallipoli

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 222, and Page 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015