Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico de Amato

Deceased

Bishop of Castro di Puglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1695³BornMontepeloso
21 Dec 172025.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 175054.4AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
1 Mar 175054.5Ordained BishopBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
27 Jun 176973.8DiedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico de Amato:
Bishop Domenico de Amato (born , died ) Bishop of Castro di Puglia

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 153
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015