Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Ruffo

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1696³Born
21 Nov 173438.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Nov 173438.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 173539.3AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
3 Jul 173539.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lecce, Italy
3 Feb 174448.0AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
19 Mar 175458.1DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Ruffo
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Ruffo (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnara
Death PlaceCapua, Archdiocese of Capua

  • a priest for 19.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 146, and Page 261
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 15
  • d.loc: CB, 6 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast