Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agatino Maria Reggio Statella

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cefalù

Titular Archbishop of Iconium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1712BornPalermo
6 Jul 173826.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 175240.4AppointedBishop of Cefalù, Italy
23 Jul 175240.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalù, Italy
16 Jan 175542.9ResignedBishop of Cefalù, Italy
17 Feb 175543.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium

MicroData Summary for Agatino Maria Reggio Statella:
Archbishop Agatino Maria Reggio Statella (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cefalù

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013