Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Palermo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1704BornScicle
21 Jul 172622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
4 Apr 175955.0AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
8 Apr 175955.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
25 Jun 176561.2ResignedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
5 Aug 176561.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
2 Aug 177672.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Palermo:
Archbishop Girolamo Palermo C.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013