Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Lucchesi Palli

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1691Born
1 Nov 171625.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 175564.0SelectedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
21 Jul 175564.2ConfirmedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
27 Jul 175564.2Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
4 Oct 176877.4DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Lucchesi Palli
Bishop Andrea Lucchesi Palli (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast