Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jaime Cortada Bru

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1688BornBarcelona
24 Apr 175263.9AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
23 May 175264.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
26 Sep 175365.3AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
27 Apr 176273.9DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Cortada Bru:
Archbishop Jaime Cortada Bru (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 70, Number 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013