Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gian Pietro Solaro

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1696BornVillanovae Solariorum
17 Dec 171822.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 174347.5AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
26 Jul 174347.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
Jan 176872.0DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gian Pietro Solaro:
Bishop Gian Pietro Solaro (born ) Bishop of Vercelli

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013