Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Antonio de Requeséns, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1703Born
21 Sep 172622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Nov 175451.1SelectedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
17 Feb 175551.3ConfirmedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
23 Feb 175551.3Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
Jan 1773³69.2DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio de Requeséns
Bishop Giuseppe Antonio de Requeséns O.S.B. (born , died Jan 1773) Bishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,755, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast