Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Franchi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1675BornDubrovnik
26 Jan 172852.3AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
1 Feb 172852.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
22 Sep 175176.0DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Angelo Franchi:
Archbishop Angelo Franchi O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013