Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Bortone

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Diospolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1678³Born
24 Sep 170123.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 172749.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Diospolis in Thracia
1 Jan 172849.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diospolis in Thracia
22 Jul 172950.8DiedTitular Bishop of Diospolis in Thracia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bortone (VIAF: 39809370)
Bishop Giovanni Bortone (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Diospolis in Thracia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVia Piediquindici

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast