Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Gentile

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1692BornBiscari
21 Sep 171523.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 171624.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 174755.4AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
26 Nov 174755.4Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
25 Jun 177179.0DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Gentile:
Bishop Filippo Gentile (born , died ) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015