Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Capuani

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1669Born
16 Jun 169627.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 172960.5AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
31 Dec 172960.6Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
Jul 1752³83.1DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Capuani
Bishop Giovanni Battista Capuani (born , died Jul 1752) Bishop of Belcastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallata

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 116
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast