Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Pacca

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1692Born
5 Jun 175159.3Ordained PriestPriest of Benevento, Italy
20 Mar 175260.1AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
25 Mar 175260.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
14 Jul 176371.4DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pacca
Archbishop Francesco Pacca (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento

  • a priest for 12.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 121
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018