Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Giacomo Visinio Rubini, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Anagni, Italy

Titular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1663Born
10 Feb 169733.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Mar 172965.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Anagni, Italy
23 Mar 172965.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
25 Mar 172965.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
5 Dec 173673.4DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Anagni, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Giacomo Visinio Rubini
Bishop Bartolomeo Giacomo Visinio Rubini O.F.M. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Anagni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBolsena

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 83, and Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018