Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria Zuccari

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1726BornRoma
27 May 175226.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 176842.0AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
22 May 176842.0Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
26 Dec 179468.6DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Zuccari:
Bishop Angelo Maria Zuccari (born , died ) Bishop of Capaccio

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015