Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François de Pélissier de Saint-Ferréol

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vaison


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1709BornVisan
7 Jun 173223.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 May 173324.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 175849.7AppointedBishop of Vaison, France
27 Dec 175849.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vaison, France
1786²76.8ResignedBishop of Vaison, France
19 Nov 178980.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Vaison, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-François de Pélissier de Saint-Ferréol:
Bishop Charles-François de Pélissier de Saint-Ferréol (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vaison

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 433
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015