Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Casati, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1699BornMilano
18 Dec 172324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
1 Apr 175454.4AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
7 Apr 175454.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
7 Feb 178282.3DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Casati:
Bishop Michele Casati C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Mondovi

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 296
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013