Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Rosati

Deceased

Bishop of Alife


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1706BornTroia
24 Sep 172923.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 175245.6AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
25 Mar 175245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
17 Feb 175346.5DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Rosati:
Bishop Carlo Rosati (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

  • a priest for 23.4 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013