Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Saverio Antonini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Veroli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1706Born
1 Jan 173225.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 175144.8AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
26 Sep 175144.8Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
27 May 176154.5ResignedBishop of Veroli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Saverio Antonini
Bishop Pietro Saverio Antonini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Veroli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontalto

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 439
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast