Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista de Pergen

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1720³BornVienna
17 Mar 174322.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 177049.7AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
4 Mar 177049.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
12 Nov 180787.5DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista de Pergen:
Bishop Giovanni Battista de Pergen (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015