Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccol˛ Cardinal Serra

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Mitylene

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1706BornGenoa, Italy
21 Dec 175347.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Dec 175347.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 175447.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
20 Jan 175447.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
10 Feb 175447.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
Jul 1760³53.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
26 Sep 176659.8Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 176660.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
14 Dec 176761.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Serra (VIAF: 89088753)
Niccol˛ Cardinal Serra (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Mitylene

  • a priest for 13.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
  • a cardinal for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1754, Number 2
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016