Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celestino (Pietro Antonio) Orlandi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1704Born
19 Oct 172722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Sep 175449.9AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
29 Sep 175449.9Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Italy
8 Jul 177570.7DiedBishop of Molfetta, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Celestino (Pietro Antonio) Orlandi
Bishop Celestino (Pietro Antonio) Orlandi O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTricafe

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 285
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018