Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Cimaglia, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1712BornVieste
5 Mar 173522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Dec 174836.7AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
21 Dec 174836.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
27 May 176452.2DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Cimaglia:
Bishop Nicola Cimaglia O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Vieste

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013