Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Ippoliti

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1717BornPistoia
18 Mar 174124.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 175538.1AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
20 May 175538.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
15 Apr 177659.0AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
23 Mar 178063.0DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ippoliti:
Bishop Giuseppe Ippoliti (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 184, and Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015