Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Tatis, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brugnato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1692Born
22 Dec 171422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Jul 175462.5AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
28 Jul 175462.5Ordained BishopBishop of Brugnato, Italy
29 Oct 176573.7DiedBishop of Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Tatis
Bishop Domenico Tatis O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Brugnato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopSant Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,763
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 132
  • d/c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,754, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast