Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Domenico Mansi, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1692³BornLucca
9 Apr 176472.1AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
24 Apr 176472.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
27 Sep 176977.6DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico Mansi:
Archbishop Giovanni Domenico Mansi Sch. P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015