Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Giannelli

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1713Born
31 May 173825.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 175339.7AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
18 Mar 175339.8Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
Nov 1768³55.4DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Giannelli
Bishop Tommaso Giannelli (born , died Nov 1768) Bishop of Termoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitulano

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,764
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,753, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 403

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast