Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Ariberti, C.O. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1686Born
26 Dec 171024.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 171125.4ProfessedPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
26 Jan 172841.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
22 Feb 172841.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
1746¹59.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Ariberti
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Ariberti C.O. (born , died 1746) Titular Archbishop of Palmyra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona, Italy

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast