Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Scipione Sersale

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1691³BornCosenza
31 Dec 171322.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jan 171422.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 173544.4AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
3 Jul 173544.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
3 Feb 174453.0AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
11 Jul 175160.4DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scipione Sersale:
Bishop Scipione Sersale (born , died ) Bishop of Lecce

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1749
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 261, and Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015