Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Perrimezzi, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina

Titular Archbishop of Bostra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1670BornPaola
19 Dec 169323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
11 Apr 170736.3AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
25 Apr 170736.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
26 Feb 171443.1AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
18 Feb 173463.1ResignedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
24 Mar 173463.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bostra
10 Feb 174069.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Perrimezzi:
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Perrimezzi O.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 297, and Page 329
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • ob: CB, 28 Jul 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,817
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015