Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Santoro, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1681Born
10 Aug 170422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
21 Mar 172543.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
21 Mar 172543.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Samaria
25 Mar 172543.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samaria
9 Jun 173250.7AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
10 May 174159.6DiedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Santoro
Bishop Antonio Maria Santoro O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ravello e Scala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuscaldo

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 342
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast